EP0999197 - Process for the conversion of oxidised sugars to hydrogenated sugars by catalytic hydrogenation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roquette Frères 62136 Lestrem / FR | [2000/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fleche, Guy 15, rue Gambetta 59190 Hazebrouk / FR | 02 /
Fuertes, Patrick 2, avenue Kennedy 59130 Lambersart / FR | 03 /
Tamion, Rodolphe 116, rue des Déportés 62157 Allouagne / FR | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | Boulinguiez, Didier Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402486.7 | 11.10.1999 | [2000/19] | Priority number, date | FR19980012791 | 13.10.1998 Original published format: FR 9812791 | [2000/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0999197 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0999197 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/149, C07C31/18, C07C31/24, C07C31/26, C07H15/04 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
C07H15/04 (EP);
C07C29/149 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/149, C07C31/18 (EP);
C07C29/149, C07C31/24 (EP);
C07C29/149, C07C31/26 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/19] | C07C29/149, C07H15/04 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/45] |
Former [2000/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Umwandlung von oxydierten Zuckern in hydrierte Zucker durch katalytische Hydrierung | [2000/19] | English: | Process for the conversion of oxidised sugars to hydrogenated sugars by catalytic hydrogenation | [2000/19] | French: | Procédé de conversion de sucres oxydés en sucres hydrogénés par hydrogénation catalytique | [2000/19] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/21] | 16.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.09.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0820979 (CERESTAR HOLDING BV) [DX] 1-3,9-12 * page 3, line 3 - line 29 * * page 4, line 34 - page 5, line 19 * * page 7, line 27 - line 33 * * page 8, line 25 - line 32 * * table 3 *; | [A]US3935284 (KRUSE WALTER M) [A] 1,9,11,12 * column 1 - column 2 * * examples 1,2,4,21,27 *; | [DA]US5756865 (BECK ROLAND HERWIG FRIEDRICH ET AL) [DA] 1,9,11,12 * column 2 - column 4 * * example 1 *; | [DA]WO9749658 (TYLLI MATTI ;GOLDE MARTIN (FI); NYGREN JOHANNA (FI); XYROFIN OY (F) [DA] 1,9,11,12 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 2 * * example 1 * * claims 1-7 * | [A] - KOLARIC, SNJEZANA ET AL, "Comparative study of homogeneous hydrogenation of D-glucose and D-mannose catalyzed by water soluble [Ru(tri(m-sulfophenyl) phosphine )] complex", J. MOL. CATAL. A: CHEM. (1996), 110(3), 189-193, XP002108485 [A] 1,9,11,12 * page 190, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 192, column R, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1381-1169(96)00088-X |