EP0999368 - Fastening clamp, especially for hand lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEGRAND 128 Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | For all designated states Legrand SNC 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre-de-Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states LEGRAND 128 Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny F-87000 Limoges / FR | ||
For all designated states LEGRAND SNC 128, Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny F-87000 Limoges / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maziere, Laurent 34 Allée Jules Romain 87000 Limoges / FR | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2000/19] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402744.9 | 04.11.1999 | [2000/19] | Priority number, date | FR19980013985 | 06.11.1998 Original published format: FR 9813985 | [2000/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0999368 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0999368 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16B2/10, F16M13/02 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
F21V21/08 (EP,US);
F16M13/00 (EP,US);
F16M13/022 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44342 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4435 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44966 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, GB, IT [2001/04] |
Former [2000/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Befestigungsklammer, insbesondere für Handleuchte | [2000/19] | English: | Fastening clamp, especially for hand lamp | [2000/19] | French: | Pince de fixation, notamment pour baladeuse | [2000/19] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 13.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0445014 (ROUX MARCEL HENRI RENE [FR]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US5464182 (STEKELENBURG ALBERT [TW]) [A] 1,12,13* column A; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5581900 (PAYNE DOUGLAS [US]) [A] 1,6-9,12,13 * column A; figures 1-8; claims 1,9-13 *; | [A]US5819425 (PAYNE DOUGLAS [US]) [A] 1,6-13 * column A; figures 1-6,11,12; claim 1 * |