Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4547745B | Global Dossier | 22.09.2010 | B2 | JP2000160169 | 13.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9814480 | 18.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1002853 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2006 | B1 | EP1002853 | 24.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9814480 | 18.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1158378C | 21.07.2004 | C | CN1253993 | 24.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9814480 | 18.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69931876T | 05.10.2006 | T2 | DE69931876D1 | 27.07.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9814480 | 18.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2267238T | 01.03.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9814480 | 18.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2785908 | 16.12.2005 | B1 | FR2785908 | 19.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9814480 | 18.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100626623B | 25.09.2006 | B1 | KR20000035520 | 26.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9814480 | 18.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6334948 | 01.01.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | FR9814480 | 18.11.1998 |