EP1006700 - Signal carrier recovery method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2000/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanna, Charaf, THOMSON multimedia 46 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 02 /
Lopez, Patrick, THOMSON multimedia 46 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 03 /
Chevreau, Sylvain, THOMSON multimedia 46 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Kohrs, Martin, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne-Billancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402848.8 | 17.11.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | FR19980015362 | 04.12.1998 Original published format: FR 9815362 | [2000/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006700 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1006700 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/38, H04L25/03 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
H04L25/0307 (EP,US);
H04L27/3872 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/08] |
Former [2000/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Signalträgerruckgewinnungsverfahren | [2000/23] | English: | Signal carrier recovery method | [2000/23] | French: | Procédé de récupération de porteuse de signal | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2018/28] | ES | 09.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0583643 (ALCATEL ITALIA [IT]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 4 * * figure 1 *; | [A] - YAMANAKA K ET AL, "A MULTILEVEL QAM DEMODULATOR VLSI WITH WIDEBAND CARRIER RECOVERY AND DUAL EQUALIZING MODE", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, (19970701), vol. 32, no. 7, ISSN 0018-9200, pages 1101 - 1107, XP000729369 [A] 1-9 * sections II-IV * * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/4.597300 | [A] - GUIDOUX L ET AL, "LES CIRCUITS POUR MODEM", ONDE ELECTRIQUE, (19840301), vol. 64, no. 2, ISSN 0030-2430, pages 101 - 107, XP000760594 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 2 * | [A] - D'ARIA G ET AL, "FAST ADAPTIVE EQUALIZERS FOR NARROW-BAND TDMA MOBILE RADIO", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, (19910501), vol. 40, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 392 - 404, XP000234902 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/25.289420 |