EP1006547 - Closing resistor insertion mechanism with ball lock retainer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Areva T&D SA 3, avenue André Malraux, Le "Sextant" 92309 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [2006/04] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Areva T&D SA 3, avenue André Malraux, Le "Sextant" 92309 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states Alstom Holdings 25 avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ledru, Roger 44, bis rue de la rivière 38230 Tignieu / FR | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Poulin, Gérard, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Poulin, Gérard, et al Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/37] | de Lambilly Delorme, Marie Pierre, et al ALSTOM Intellectual Property Department 25, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/23] | Gosse, Michel, et al ALSTOM Intellectual Property Department 25,avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/09] | Hagel, Francis Alstom Technologies, CIPD, 23/25, avenue Morane Saulnier 92360 Meudon La Forêt / FR | ||
Former [2000/23] | Gosse, Michel ALSTOM Technology - C.I.P.D. 5, Avenue Newton 92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402903.1 | 23.11.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | FR19980015035 | 30.11.1998 Original published format: FR 9815035 | [2000/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006547 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1006547 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/16 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
H01C10/50 (KR);
H01H33/166 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2001/08] |
Former [2000/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einfügungsmechanismus mit Kugelverriegelung, für Einschaltwiderstand | [2000/23] | English: | Closing resistor insertion mechanism with ball lock retainer | [2000/23] | French: | Mécanisme d'insertion d'une résistance de fermeture avec un verrouillage à bille | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 28.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 25.01.2006 | SE | 25.04.2006 | [2007/21] |
Former [2006/46] | SE | 25.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2553926 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 2-4; claims 1,4,5 *; | [A]US4338500 (PHAM VAN DOAN, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, paragraph L - column 3, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US4324959 (HALL WALTER J, et al) [A] 1 * figure 4 * |