EP1006054 - Blister package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [2000/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suire, Michel 9, rue des Hirondelles 91210 Draveil / FR | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99402962.7 | 29.11.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | FR19980015114 | 01.12.1998 Original published format: FR 9815114 | [2000/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006054 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/34 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
B65D75/327 (EP);
B65D2575/3227 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/23] | Title | German: | Blisterpackung | [2000/23] | English: | Blister package | [2000/23] | French: | Emballage du type "blister" | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 27.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/21] | 23.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0148118 (SANDOZ AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 2, line 9 - page 4, line 24 * * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 7 * * figures 1-9 * [A] 7-11; | [Y]WO9316673 (TOREN CUNSULTING PTY LTD [AU]) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 34 * * page 8, line 1 - line 9 * * figures 1-29 *; | [A]JPH07257641 (SONY CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 6 * | by applicant | EP0146063 | EP0148118 |