EP1008660 - Low alloy steel for oil country tubular goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Metal Industries Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Sumitomo Metal Industries Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kushida, Takahiro 4-1-603, Ohama 2-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0022 / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Kunio 1-11-2, Yurinokidai Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1324 / JP | 03 /
Miyata, Kaori 2-1-408, Sakuraencho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0828 / JP | 04 /
Omura, Tomohiko 33-1-106, Tadeharacho, Takano Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8101 / JP | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Uchida, Kenji, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Uchida, Kenji, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot et Autres Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99403073.2 | 08.12.1999 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | JP19980349460 | 09.12.1998 Original published format: JP 34946098 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008660 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008660 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/10, C21D6/02, C21D8/02, C22C38/22, C22C38/24 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
C21D6/02 (EP,US);
C21D1/18 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/09] |
Former [2000/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Niedrig legierter Stahl für ölindustrielle röhrenförmige Gegenstände | [2000/24] | English: | Low alloy steel for oil country tubular goods | [2000/24] | French: | Acier faiblement allié pour des articles tubulaires de l' industrie pétrolière | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPS54117311 ; | [A]JPH0250916 ; | [A]WO9617964 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-18 * * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph 4 * * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 3 *; | [X]EP0828007 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1-6 * * page 18, line 20 - page 28, line 23 *; | [DX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 43, Database accession no. 1979-77863B, XP002133740 & JPS54117311 A 19790912 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [DX] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900508), vol. 014, no. 215, Database accession no. (C - 0716), & JP02050916 A 19900220 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [DA] - J.C. CHARBONNIER ET AL, "SULFIDE STRESS CRACKING OF HIGH STRENGTH MODIFIED Cr-Mo STEELS", TRANSACTIONS OF THE METALLURGICAL SOCIETY OF AIME., METALLURGICAL SOCIETY OF AIME INC. NEW YORK., US, (1995), vol. 16A, no. 5, pages 935 - 944, XP002133739 [DA] 1-4 * page 935 - page 944 * |