EP1008787 - Double contact seal brush [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNECMA MOTEURS 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2004/02] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plona, Daniel Georges 4 rue des Basses Grièches 77870 Vulaines sur Seine / FR | 02 /
Thore, Monique Andrée 9 avenue de la plaine haute 91560 Crosnes / FR | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Nguyen, Dominique Snecma Département Propriété Intellectuelle - WRS/DJIB 77550 Moissy Cramayel / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Nguyen, Dominique Snecma Département Propriété Intellectuelle - WRS/DJIB 77550 Moissy Cramayel / FR | ||
Former [2004/46] | Nguyen, Dominique Snecma Moteurs Département Propriété Industrielle W/DJB Site de Villaroche 77550 Moissy Cramayel / FR | ||
Former [2004/02] | Berrou, Paul, et al Snecma Moteurs Propriété Intellectuelle, B.P. 81 91003 Evry Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99403084.9 | 09.12.1999 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | FR19980015572 | 10.12.1998 Original published format: FR 9815572 | [2000/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008787 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008787 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
F16J15/3288 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/09] |
Former [2000/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Doppelkontakt- Bürstendichtung | [2000/24] | English: | Double contact seal brush | [2000/24] | French: | Joint à brosse à double contact | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 09.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Request for further processing for: | 21.01.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0211275 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]FR2607893 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |