EP1008782 - Gear shift procedure and device for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states RENAULT 34 Quai du Point du Jour 92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saint-Jean, Alain 13, rue Eugène Sue 92290 Chatenay-Malabry / FR | [2000/24] | Application number, filing date | 99403107.8 | 10.12.1999 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | FR19980015660 | 11.12.1998 Original published format: FR 9815660 | [2000/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008782 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/12 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
F16H3/12 (EP);
F16H2003/0931 (EP);
F16H2200/0052 (EP);
F16H3/093 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2001/09] |
Former [2000/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gangwechsel-Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2000/24] | English: | Gear shift procedure and device for motor vehicles | [2000/24] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de changement de vitesses pour véhicule automobile | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 15.12.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 14.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR1003128 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2,3; | [XA]JPH06129533 ; | [A]US4023443 (USUI KEIZABURO, et al) [A] 1-4 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US5259260 (SCHNEIDER ARTHUR [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 4 - column 5; figure 1 *; | [A]US4802373 (SAINT-JEAN ALAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1,5,10 * column W *; | [A]EP0276609 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940811), vol. 018, no. 432, Database accession no. (M - 1654), & JP06129533 A 19940510 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,3 |