EP1018652 - Measuring circuit for electric cells mounted in series [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2000/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carton, Jean-Luc 21, Chemin du Baratage 91440 Bures sur Yvette / FR | 02 /
Morin, Christophe 34, rue Michel Montaigne 33290 Blanchefort / FR | 03 /
Perelle, Michel 18, rue de la Chanterie 37210 Parcay-Meslay / FR | 04 /
Equoy, Régis 13B, Impasse Robespierre 33160 St Medard en Jalles / FR | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Pochart, François, et al Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/22] | Pochart, François, et al Cabinet Hirsch 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/28] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99403119.3 | 13.12.1999 | [2000/28] | Priority number, date | FR19990000089 | 07.01.1999 Original published format: FR 9900089 | [2000/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1018652 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
G01R31/396 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/13] |
Former [2000/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Messchaltung für eine Reienschaltung von elektrischen Zellen | [2000/28] | English: | Measuring circuit for electric cells mounted in series | [2000/28] | French: | Circuit de mesure pour ensemble de cellules électriques montées en série | [2000/28] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 08.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/08] | 22.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08136630 ; | [DA]US5578927 (PERELLE MICHEL [FR]) [DA] 1,2 * claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 096, no. 009, & JP08136630 A 19960531 (ADVANTEST CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |