EP1111941 - Method for enabling interaction between a user terminal and a service control point in a intelligent network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue de la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Genette, Michel Jose Claude Ghislain Rue du Moulin 45 5081 Bovesse / BE | 02 /
De Parades, Matthieu Henri 63 Av. du Maréchal Douglas Haig 78000 Versailles / FR | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse Alcatel-Lucent Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse Alcatel Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [2007/24] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse Alcatel Bell N.V. Intellectual Property Department Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [2001/26] | Plas, Axel Alcatel Bell N.V., Francis Wellesplein 1 2018 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 99403258.9 | 23.12.1999 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1111941 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1111941 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00, H04M3/42, H04M3/493 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
H04Q3/0029 (EP,US);
H04M3/51 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13072 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13103 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13345 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren für das Aktivieren von Interaktion zwischen einem Benutzerterminal und einer Dienststeuereinheit in einem intelligenten Netz | [2007/42] | English: | Method for enabling interaction between a user terminal and a service control point in a intelligent network | [2001/26] | French: | Méthode pour permettre l'interaction entre un terminal d'utilisateur et un point de commande de service dans un réseau intelligent | [2007/42] |
Former [2001/26] | Verfahren für das Aktivieren von Interaktion zwischen einem Benutzerterminal und einem Dienststeuereinheit in einem intelligenten Netz | ||
Former [2001/26] | Méthode pour permettre l'interaction entre un terminal d'utilisateur et un point de commande de service dans intelligent un réseau | Examination procedure | 27.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/10] | 19.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.03.2008 | BE | 05.03.2008 | CY | 05.03.2008 | DK | 05.03.2008 | FI | 05.03.2008 | IT | 05.03.2008 | NL | 05.03.2008 | SE | 05.06.2008 | GR | 06.06.2008 | ES | 16.06.2008 | PT | 05.08.2008 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/06] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CY | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
IT | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 16.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5164981 (MITCHELL JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 21 * * column 4, line 40 - line 58 *; | [Y]EP0873029 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract ** column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 16; figure 2 * |