EP1018596 - Method of modulating the power of a two-stroke internal combustion engine with a resonator connected to the crankcase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | For all designated states PEUGEOT MOTOCYCLES Rue du 17 Novembre F-25350 Beaulieu Mandeure / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue du Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states PEUGEOT MOTOCYCLES Rue du 17 Novembre F-25350 Beaulieu Mandeure / FR | |||
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states PEUGEOT MOTOCYCLES Rue du 17 Novembre F-25350 Beaulieu Mandeure / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dabadie, Jean-Charles 135 rue Danton 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | 02 /
Duret, Pierre 120 rue de la Paix 78500 Sartrouville / FR | 03 /
Venturi, Stéphane 9 rue de la Fôret 77000 La Rochette / FR | 04 /
Lavy, Jacques 24 rue de l'Ecosse 78280 Guillancourt / FR | 05 /
Lefèbvre, Jean-Louis 16 rue du Grillon 25550 Dung / FR | [2000/28] | Application number, filing date | 99403283.7 | 24.12.1999 | [2000/28] | Priority number, date | FR19990000157 | 08.01.1999 Original published format: FR 9900157 | [2000/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1018596 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1018596 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02B25/14 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
F02B25/14 (EP);
F02B33/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT [2001/13] |
Former [2000/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Leistungssteuerung einer Zweitaktbrennkraftmaschine mittels mit dem Kurbelgehäuse verbundenen Resonator | [2000/28] | English: | Method of modulating the power of a two-stroke internal combustion engine with a resonator connected to the crankcase | [2000/28] | French: | Procédé de modulation de puissance d'un moteur à combustion interne à 2 temps par un résonateur relié au carterpompe | [2000/28] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS5918229 ; | [YA]JPS54106723 ; | [Y]FR2623564 (OUTBOARD MARINE) [Y] 7 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 4 *; | [A]WO9744571 (KUBOTA) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR1349344 (ATELIERS DE LA MOTOBÉCANE) [A] 1 * page 1, column L, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 *; | [A]EP0002969 (ATELIERS DE LA MOTOBÉCANE) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 4 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 23 *; | [A]DE3803320 (WIMMER) [A] 1 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 9 * * column 4, line 33 - line 62; figure 2 *; | [A]JPS5987230 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840519), vol. 8, no. 108, Database accession no. (M - 297), & JP59018229 A 19840130 (YAMAHA) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * [Y] 6,7 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19791027), vol. 3, no. 130, Database accession no. (M - 078), & JP54106723 A 00000000 (NIPPON SOKEN) [Y] 6 * abstract * [A] 1 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840911), vol. 8, no. 197, Database accession no. (M - 324), & JP59087230 A 19840519 (SHIYUUICHI KITAMURA) [A] 1 * abstract * |