EP0952097 - Device for changing the load-moving conditions on a roller conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2004 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rouleaux Pack SA Rue du Moulin 42130 Boen Sur Lignon / FR | [1999/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gauchon, Christian Le Bruchet 42600 Moingt / FR | [1999/43] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2003/05] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [1999/43] | Perrier, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 rue de la République 42000 St-Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 99420100.2 | 21.04.1999 | [1999/43] | Priority number, date | FR19980005218 | 21.04.1998 Original published format: FR 9805218 | [1999/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0952097 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0952097 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65G13/10 | [1999/43] | CPC: |
B65G13/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/27] |
Former [1999/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Änderung der Lastverschiebungskonditionen auf einem Rollenförderer | [1999/43] | English: | Device for changing the load-moving conditions on a roller conveyor | [1999/43] | French: | Dispositif pour modifier les conditions de déplacement d'une charge sur un convoyeur à rouleaux | [1999/43] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 12.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 26.11.2003 | IT | 26.11.2003 | DE | 27.02.2004 | ES | 09.03.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/46] | GB | 26.11.2003 | |
DE | 27.02.2004 | ||
ES | 09.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | GB | 26.11.2003 | |
DE | 27.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | DE | 27.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0781717 (ITOH ELECTRIC COMPANY LIMITED [JP]) [A] 1,11 * column 6, line 41 - column 18, line 11; figure - *; | [A]US3356236 (SHAW HUGH H, et al); | [A]US3370685 (GUILIE JOE D) |