EP1055737 - Device for rotating cylindrical rods during a quenching operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERMAT 169 Avenue Charles de Gaulle F-69160 Tassin-la-Demi-Lune / FR | [2000/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lunetta, Antoine chemin de saint Roch 13430 Eyguieres / FR | 02 /
Bertholon, Alain 39, avenue Misery 69160 Tassin la Demi Lune / FR | [2000/48] | Application number, filing date | 99420113.5 | 07.05.1999 | [2000/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1055737 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1055737 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/63, C21D9/00 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
C21D1/63 (EP);
C21D9/0075 (EP);
C21D9/0018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2001/33] |
Former [2000/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Drehen von zylindrischen Stäben während eines Abschreckverfahrens | [2000/48] | English: | Device for rotating cylindrical rods during a quenching operation | [2000/48] | French: | Dispositif de mise en rotation de barres cylindriques pendant une opération de trempe | [2000/48] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 30.05.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 12.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.07.2002 | 31.05.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.09.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.04.2004 | IT | 14.04.2004 | DE | 15.07.2004 | ES | 25.07.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2005/14] | GB | 14.04.2004 | |
DE | 15.07.2004 | ||
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | GB | 14.04.2004 | |
ES | 25.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | GB | 14.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0172250 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]); | [A]US3812909 (GRODZITSKY E, et al); | [A]FR1548165 (STEIN ET ROUBAIX) |