EP1050284 - Metacarpo-phalangeal or inter-phalangeal joint prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2002 [2002/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIXANO SA 13 Boulevard Victor Hugo F-01000 Bourg en Bresse / FR | [2000/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Regnard, Pierre-Jean 4, rue de la Toison d'Or 21800 Chevigny St. Sauveur / FR | 02 /
Sartorius, Christian 3, chemin des Buisses 38240 Meylan / FR | 03 /
Lemarechal, Pierre 41, route de Caranusca 57100 Thionville / FR | 04 /
Martin, Jean-Jacques 13, boulevard Victor Hugo 01000 Bourg en Bresse / FR | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99420115.0 | 07.05.1999 | [2000/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050284 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/42 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
A61F2/4241 (EP);
A61F2/30767 (EP);
A61F2002/30153 (EP);
A61F2002/30367 (EP);
A61F2002/3037 (EP);
A61F2002/30607 (EP);
A61F2002/30616 (EP);
A61F2002/30624 (EP);
A61F2002/30878 (EP);
A61F2002/4243 (EP);
A61F2002/4251 (EP);
A61F2220/0033 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/30] |
Former [2000/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Metacarpophalangeal- oder Interphalangeal-Gelenkprothese | [2000/45] | English: | Metacarpo-phalangeal or inter-phalangeal joint prosthesis | [2000/45] | French: | Prothèse d'articulation métacarpo-phalangienne ou inter-phalangienne | [2000/45] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/11] | 11.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.06.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.06.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.06.2001 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2736818 (JBS SA [FR]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5534033 (SIMPSON CHARLES L [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 18; figure - *; | [A]FR2712180 (JBS SA [FR]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US5133761 (KROUSKOP THOMAS A [US]) [A] 3 * figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]FR2743717 (MAKSENE PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 4,6 * page 6, line 28 - line 32; figure 1; claim 7 *; | [A]FR2699399 (LUER SA [FR]) [A] 5 * page 4, line 12 *; | [A]EP0611560 (LANDANGER LANDOS SA [FR], et al) [A] 6 * abstract *; | [E]FR2770771 (FIXANO [FR]) [E] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0524874 (HADES [FR]); | [A]EP0280424 (DOW CORNING [US]) |