EP0972544 - Method of producing a snow sliding board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKIS ROSSIGNOL S.A. Rue Butterlin, BP 329, Le Menon F-38509 Voiron Cédex / FR | [2000/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deborde, Henri-Charles Le Bernardin 38850 Bilieu / FR | 02 /
Magoni, Fabrice 5, Rue Molière 38500 Voiron / FR | [2000/03] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69134 Ecully Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2002/22] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/03] | Wind, Jacques CABINET JACQUES WIND 47, rue Benoit Bennier B.P. 30 69751 Charbonnières-les-Bains Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99420138.2 | 18.06.1999 | [2000/03] | Priority number, date | FR19980009322 | 17.07.1998 Original published format: FR 9809322 | [2000/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0972544 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0972544 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63C5/00 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
A63C5/003 (EP,US);
A63C5/126 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1043 (EP,US);
Y10T156/109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE [2000/39] |
Former [2000/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Schneegleitbretts | [2000/03] | English: | Method of producing a snow sliding board | [2000/03] | French: | Procédé de realisation d'un ski ou autre planche de glisse sur neige | [2000/03] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 20.07.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 18.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IE | 07.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.08.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.08.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2506289 (SARNER TYROL GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]FR2660251 (ROSSIGNOL SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0606556 (SALOMON SA [FR]) [A] 1,4-8 * the whole document * | Examination | FR2702668 | by applicant | FR2702668 | FR2740981 |