|
09.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2003 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2003 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2003 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.09.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.07.2002 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.06.2002 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.09.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.09.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2001 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2000 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2000 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.2000 |
Communication regarding the forthcoming grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.2000 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.11.1999 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.10.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1999 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
10.08.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.1999 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.1999 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.1999 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.1999 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.01.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1999 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
04.01.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
04.01.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |