Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0928869
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.05.2003 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] |
21.01.2003 |
Revocation of patent |
|
19.12.2002 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
03.07.2002 |
Communication of examination report in opposition |
|
22.02.2002 |
Observations of proprietor to parties involved |
|
10.10.2001 |
Observations of proprietor to parties involved |
|
10.10.2001 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
26.09.2001 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
17.05.2001 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
13.04.2001 |
Opposition filed |
published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] |
10.04.2001 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
19.05.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] |
12.05.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
19.04.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
03.04.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
11.02.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
04.02.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.02.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] |
12.11.1999 |
First examination report |
|
11.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.11.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.11.1999 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
28.05.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] |
28.05.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] |
29.04.1999 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|