Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0930739 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2005 | A3 | EP0930739 | 21.07.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19801875 | 20.01.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2257567 | 20.07.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19801875 | 20.01.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19801875 | 22.07.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19801875 | 20.01.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6714518 | 30.03.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19801875 | 20.01.1998 |