EP0977395 - Method of secure monochannel transfer of data between nodes of a network, computer network and computer nodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2006/14] |
Former [2000/05] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nikolaus, König, Dipl.-Ing. Mailergasse 6 2320 Schwechat / AT | 02 /
Reichl, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Danhausergasse 8/16 1040 Wien / AT | 03 /
Veider, Alfred, Dr. Böckhgasse 7/10/4 1120 Wien / AT | 04 /
Fitzke, André, Dipl.-Ing. Hermannstrasse 6 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | 05 /
Kantz, Heinz, Dr. Anton Krieger-Gasse 1-23/K2 1230 Wien / AT | 06 /
Neuerburg, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Zellerstrasse 72 70180 Stuttgart / DE | 07 /
Arnold, Stefan, Dipl.-Ing. Porschestrasse 9 71706 Markgröningen / DE | 08 /
Kohler, Dietmar Eichendorffstrasse 5 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 09 /
Maier, Matthias, Dipl.-Ing. Schaichhofstrasse 7 71155 Altdorf / DE | 10 /
Püntzner, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. C-M-v-Weber-Strasse 62 71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Menzietti, Domenico, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Menzietti, Domenico, Dipl.-Ing, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart Postfach 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99440213.9 | 28.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | DE1998133867 | 28.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19833867 | [2000/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0977395 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977395 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, G06F11/10, G06F11/18 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
H04L1/0061 (EP);
H04L1/0041 (EP);
H04L1/0076 (EP);
H04L1/22 (EP);
H04L2001/0097 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur sicheren einkanaligen Übertragung von Daten zwischen den Rechnerknoten eines Rechnerverbundes sowie Rechnerverbund und Rechnerknoten | [2005/43] | English: | Method of secure monochannel transfer of data between nodes of a network, computer network and computer nodes | [2000/05] | French: | Méthode de transfert monocanal sécurisé de données entre les noeuds de calcul d'un réseau d'ordinateurs ainsi qu'un réseau d'ordinateurs et que des noeuds de calculs | [2000/05] |
Former [2000/05] | Verfahren zur sicheren einkanaligen Uebertragung von Daten zwischen den Rechnerknoten eines Rechnerverbundes sowie Rechnerverbund und Rechnerknoten | Examination procedure | 14.03.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 20.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.04.2006 | FI | 05.04.2006 | IE | 05.04.2006 | NL | 05.04.2006 | DK | 05.07.2006 | SE | 05.07.2006 | GR | 06.07.2006 | ES | 16.07.2006 | AT | 28.07.2006 | LU | 28.07.2006 | BE | 31.07.2006 | CH | 31.07.2006 | LI | 31.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | PT | 05.09.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
AT | 28.07.2006 | ||
LU | 28.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
GR | 06.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
AT | 28.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/17] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
AT | 28.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
IE | 05.04.2006 | ||
NL | 05.04.2006 | ||
DK | 05.07.2006 | ||
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 05.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | FI | 05.04.2006 | |
SE | 05.07.2006 | ||
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 05.07.2006 | |
ES | 16.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 05.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4315710 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0720337 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,9,16* figure 1; claim 1 * |