EP1102242 - Method for personalising speech output [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75088 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trompf, Michael, Dr.-Ing. Buchenstrasse 10 71296 Heimsheim / DE | 02 /
Sienel, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Alte Dorfstrasse 5 71229 Leonberg / DE | 03 /
Kopp, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Brandstrasse 1 75428 Illingen / DE | 04 /
Lecomte, Daniel 157, rue de la pompe F-75116 Paris / FR | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Knecht, Ulrich Karl Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Knecht, Ulrich Karl Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2001/21] | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Stuttgart 70430 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99440325.1 | 22.11.1999 | [2001/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1102242 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
G10L19/0018 (EP);
G10L2019/0005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/08] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Personalisierung von Sprachausgabe | [2001/21] | English: | Method for personalising speech output | [2001/21] | French: | Procédé de personalisation de sortie vocale | [2001/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/46] | 10.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.02.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.02.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5012518 (LIU ET AL.) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 34 - line 50 *; | [Y]US5388181 (ANDERSON ET AL.) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 15 - line 39 *; | [A]FR2771544 (SAGEM) [A] 1 * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 13 *; | [A]EP0718819 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT) [A] 1 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 5 *; | [A]WO9729482 (UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA) [A] 1 * page 91, line 23 - page 95, line 15 *; | [A]US5890108 (YELDENER) [A] 1 * column 22, line 43 - column 23, line 13 * |