EP1013909 - Air plenum chamber for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.G.I. Coutier S.A. 01410 Champfromier / FR | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jaunasse, Philippe 32 Boulevard Vaugirard 75015 Paris / FR | 02 /
Prique, Eric 2 Rue des Vregers 68720 Luemschwiller / FR | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A. 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach B.P. 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet Nithardt & Associés S.A. 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach B.P. 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/26] | Nithardt, Roland CABINET NITHARDT ET ASSOCIES 14 Boulevard Alfred Wallach BP 1445 68071 Mulhouse Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 99440371.5 | 23.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | FR19980016601 | 24.12.1998 Original published format: FR 9816601 | [2000/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013909 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02B27/02 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
F02M35/10354 (EP);
F02B27/0215 (EP);
F02B27/0257 (EP);
F02B27/0263 (EP);
F02M35/10039 (EP);
F02M35/116 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | Luftsammler einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2000/26] | English: | Air plenum chamber for an internal combustion engine | [2000/26] | French: | Répartiteur d'admission d'air pour un moteur à combustion interne | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/09] | 24.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO9924702 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE], et al) [XP] 1-3,5 * page 14, paragraph 3 - page 15, paragraph 2; figures 6,7 *; | [DA]EP0848145 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 3, line 13 - line 19 * * column 4, line 14 - line 27; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US5156117 (MUELLER ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3940486 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH10299489 ; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 099, no. 002, & JP10299489 A 19981110 (TAIHO KOGYO CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - BAUDER A ET AL, "DIE TRIEBWERKE DES AUDI A8", MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, (19940501), vol. 55, no. 5, ISSN 0024-8525, pages 256 - 258, 260, 26, XP000439553 [A] 1 * figures 3,4 * |