03.02.2006 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
26.07.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.07.2004 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
14.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2004 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
23.03.2004 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.01.2004 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
24.01.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.01.2004 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.01.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.09.2003 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.08.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.08.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] |
25.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.12.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.07.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.11.2001 |
First examination report |
|
26.11.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.01.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
11.11.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
31.03.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] |
25.02.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |