EP0993145 - System for broadcasting alarm messages to selected users of an IP network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foncarnier, Olivier Residence les Magnolias, 147 Avenue des Poilus 06140 Vence / FR | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | de Pena, Alain IBM France Intellectual Property Dept. Le Plan du bois 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | de Pena, Alain IBM France Intellectual Property Dept. Le Plan du bois 06610 La Gaude / FR | ||
Former [2000/15] | Etorre, Yves Nicolas Compagnie IBM France, Département Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 99480073.8 | 29.07.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | EP19980480066 | 08.10.1998 Original published format: EP 98480066 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0993145 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18, H04L12/24, H04L29/06 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
H04L12/1836 (EP);
H04L41/0213 (EP);
H04L41/06 (EP);
H04L41/0604 (EP);
H04L12/1895 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/52] |
Former [2000/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System zur Übertragung von Alarmmeldungen zu ausgewählten Benutzern von einem IP-Netzwerk | [2000/15] | English: | System for broadcasting alarm messages to selected users of an IP network | [2000/15] | French: | Système de diffusion de messages d'alarme à utilisateurs selectionnés d'un réseau IP | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 29.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5339392 (RISBERG JEFFREY S [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract ** column 2, line 25 - column 5, line 37 *; | [A]EP0738961 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD [JP]) [A] 7,14 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, line 48 - page 3, column 4, line 14 *; | [Y]WO9727546 (EX MACHINA INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,8-11,13 * abstract * * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 24 * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 19 * * page 12, line 13 - line 25 * * page 19, line 19 - line 29 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y] - COLLINSON P, "Network Flight Recorder", CENTAUR COMMUNICATIONS, UK, (199807), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 47 - 52, XP002128934 [Y] 1-4,8-11,13 * page 51, column L, line 8 - line 25 * |