EP1014440 - Area array air gap structure for intermetal dielectric application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chartered Semiconductor Manufacturing Pte Ltd. 60 Woodlands Industrial Estate Park D, Street 2 Singapore 738406 / SG | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Chartered Semiconductor Manufacturing Pte Ltd. 60 Woodlands Industrial Estate Park D, Street 2 Singapore 738406 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lap, Chan 1631, Larkin St. No. 3 (SF CA) 94109 San Francisco, California / US | 02 /
Kheng Chok, Tee 76, Jin Berus off, Jin Kim Chuon 42000 Pore Klang, Selangor / MY | 03 /
Kok Keng, Ong Blk 132, Choa Cuo Kang Ave 1, No. 4-12, S 68032 Singapore / SG | 04 /
Chin Hwee, Seah Blk 119 Bukit, Merah View, No. 06-53 152119 Singapore / SG | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Schuffenecker, Thierry 97, chemin de Cassiopée, Domaine de l'étoile 06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 99480130.6 | 16.12.1999 | [2000/26] | Priority number, date | US19980216823 | 21.12.1998 Original published format: US 216823 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1014440 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1014440 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
H01L21/7682 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | Gitterförmige Anordnung von Luftbrückenstrukturen für Zwischenmetalldielektrikanwendungen | [2000/26] | English: | Area array air gap structure for intermetal dielectric application | [2000/26] | French: | Réseau plan d'une couche d'air pour des couches diélectriques entre deux métallisations | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 17.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/51] | 03.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/51] | Request for further processing for: | 27.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 27.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.06.2006 | Decision despatched | 07.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 07.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   07.03.2005 | 31.12.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5324683 (FITCH JON T [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7,8,14,24,25 * column 5, lines 66-68; figure 15; claims 19,20 *; | [A]US5461003 (HAVEMANN ROBERT H [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]US5814555 (BANDYOPADHYAY BASAB [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]US5828121 (LUR WATER [TW], et al) [A] * abstract * |