blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0978660

EP0978660 - Fastening device, consisting of a clamping device and of a fastening rod, for joining two parts to one another [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THIRIET
Chemin de Sury
08000 Warcq / FR
[2003/30]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Thiriet Fils Société Anonyme
Chemin de Sury
08000 Warcq / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Thiriet, Philippe
Route de Fagnon
08420 Warcq / FR
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Duthoit, Michel Georges André
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés
96/98, Boulevard Carnot
B.P. 105
59027 Lille Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Duthoit, Michel
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 19, Square Dutilleul BP 105
59027 Lille Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date99490024.902.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateFR1998001034807.08.1998         Original published format: FR 9810348
[2000/06]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978660
Date:09.02.2000
Language:FR
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978660
Date:02.04.2003
Language:FR
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.1999
ClassificationIPC:F16B2/06, F16B43/02
[2000/06]
CPC:
F16B43/025 (EP); F16B2/065 (EP); F16B2/10 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/43]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Klemmvorrichtung, bestehend aus einer Spannvorrichtung und einer Fixierstange, zum gegenseitigen Verbinden von zwei Teilen[2002/34]
English:Fastening device, consisting of a clamping device and of a fastening rod, for joining two parts to one another[2000/06]
French:Dispositif de serrage, constitué d'une bride et d'une tige d'assemblage, destiné à retenir deux pièces l'une contre l'autre[2000/06]
Former [2000/06]Klemmvorrichtnung, bestehend aus einer Spannvorrichtung und einer Fixierstange, zum gegenseitigen Verbinden von zwei Teilen
Examination procedure07.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
10.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
05.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2002Fee for grant paid
11.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0541147  (FURGOCAR SRL [IT]) [X] 1-9 * column 3, line 10 - column 5, line 2; figures 1-4 *;
 [XY]FR2677714  (POMMIER & CIE [FR]) [X] 1,5-10 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 20; figures 3-8 * [Y] 2-4;
 [Y]EP0431209  (ERICO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2-4 * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 8; figures 1-7 *;
 [X]GB2280484  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,5-8 * page 12, line 12 - page 13, line 17; figures 13-16 *;
 [A]DE2041607  (GUTEHOFFNUNGSHUETTE STERKRADE) [A] 1,5-7 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE9108501U  (MÜHLMEISTER) [A] 1,5-7 * page 5, line 1 - page 7, line 7; figures 1-7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.