EP0939307 - Automatic weighing machines for food products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TALLERES DAUMAR S.A. Guifré 794-796 08918 Badalona (Barcelona) / ES | [1999/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dauder Guardiola, Agustin Guifré, 794-796 08918 Badalona (Barcelona) / ES | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr. Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [1999/35] | Canadell-Isern, Roberto Travessera de Gracia 30, 1 C 08021 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 99500031.2 | 23.02.1999 | [1999/35] | Priority number, date | ES19980000398 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: ES 9800398 | [1999/35] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939307 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0939307 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/393 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
G01G19/393 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT [2000/19] |
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatische Waagen für Nahrungsmittel | [1999/35] | English: | Automatic weighing machines for food products | [1999/35] | French: | Balances automatiques pour nourriture | [1999/35] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 21.03.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 31.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.01.2001 | IE | 23.02.2001 | DK | 24.04.2001 | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/09] | NL | 24.01.2001 | |
IE | 23.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | IE | 23.02.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0534889 (DAUMAR TALLERES [ES]) [AD] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]GB2305734 (DAUMAR TALLERES [ES]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 31 - page 7, line 7; figure 7 * |