EP0950973 - Laser Marking System [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Macsa ID, S.A. Calle Girona 46-48 08240 Manresa / ES | [1999/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ibanes Baron, José Miguel Girona 46-48 08240 Manresa (Barcelona) / ES | 02 /
Beringues Algue, Jordi Girona 46-48 08240 Manresa (Barcelona) / ES | 03 /
Sans Ravellat, Ramon Girona 46-48 08240 Manresa (Barcelona) / ES | [1999/42] | Representative(s) | Durán Moya, Carlos DURAN-CORRETJER Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1999/42] | Duran Moya, Carlos c/o DURAN-CORRETJER, Paseo de Gracia 101 pral. 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 99500043.7 | 16.03.1999 | [1999/42] | Priority number, date | ES19980000582 | 17.03.1998 Original published format: ES 9800582 | [1999/42] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0950973 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0950973 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K1/12, B23K26/06 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
G06K1/126 (EP,US);
G06K15/1261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/07] |
Former [1999/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lasermarkiersystem | [1999/42] | English: | Laser Marking System | [1999/42] | French: | Système de marquage au laser | [1999/42] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 23.11.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.06.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/44] | 19.08.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/44] | Appeal following examination | 25.01.2005 | Appeal received No. T0440/05 | 22.03.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.08.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4652722 (STONE JOSEPH J [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,10 * column 3, line 8 - line 18 * * column 4, line 7 - line 10 * * claims 1,4 *; | [A]US4743091 (GELBART DANIEL [CA]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US3858186 (BARKER R) [A] 3,11 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]US5463200 (JAMES DOUGLAS J [CA], et al) [A] 1,2,4,11 * claims 1,3 * |