EP1063464 - Insulating sleeve for cables or pipes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gergonne GPI Espagne, S.L. Pgno. Ind. Camp Llarg, 8 08740 Sant Adnreu de la Barca / ES | [2000/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raventos Gallofre, Juan Pgno. Ind. Camp Llarg, 8 08740 Sant Andreu de la Barca / ES | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Marques Alos, Fernando Tuset, 34 08006 Barcelona / ES | [2000/52] | Application number, filing date | 99500107.0 | 23.06.1999 | [2000/52] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1063464 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16L59/02, H02G15/18 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
H02G15/18 (EP);
B60R16/0215 (EP);
F16L59/02 (EP);
F16L59/14 (EP);
H01B7/186 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/37] |
Former [2000/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dämmhülse für Kabel oder Rohre | [2000/52] | English: | Insulating sleeve for cables or pipes | [2000/52] | French: | Manchon d' isolation pour cables ou tuyaux | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/13] | 22.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.08.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.08.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.08.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5178923 (ANDRIEU HUBERT ET AL) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]US3941159 (TOLL WOLCOTT) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3619399 (FESTO KG) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US5725423 (STEPHENS ALAN N ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract * |