EP0937774 - Lactic acid bacteria having a reduced pyruvate dehydrogenase activity and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1999 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chr. Hansen A/S Bøge Allé 10-12 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states Chr. Hansen A/S Boege Allé 10-12 2970 Hoersholm / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nilsson, Dan Gefionsbakken 4A 3060 Espergaerde / DK | 02 /
Henriksen, Claus Maxel Classensgade 19B, 3.tv. 2100 Copenhagen / DK | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners A/S Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 1021 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 99610011.1 | 18.02.1999 | [1999/34] | Priority number, date | DK19980000241 | 20.02.1998 Original published format: DK 24198 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937774 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/02, C12N1/20, C12N15/01, C12P7/18, C12P7/26, C12P7/42, A23L1/03 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
C12N9/0008 (EP);
A23L29/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Milchsäurebakterien mit erniedrigte Pyruvatdehydrogenase Activität und ihren Verwendung | [1999/34] | English: | Lactic acid bacteria having a reduced pyruvate dehydrogenase activity and use thereof | [1999/34] | French: | Bactéries lactiques ayant l'activité pyruvate déhydrogenase réduite et leur utilisation | [1999/34] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 31.08.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9807843 (HANSENS LAB ;NILSSON DAN (DK)) [PX] 1-5 * abstract * * page 33 * * claims *; | [Y] - YAMAZAKI A. ET AL., "Mutants of Streptococcus faecalis concerning pyruvate dehydrogenation.", FEBS LETTERS, (19760501), vol. 64, no. 2, pages 364 - 368, XP002066637 [Y] 1-7 * page 364, column 2 * * table 1 * * table 2 * * page 366, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(76)80329-8 | [Y] - SNOEP J.L. ET AL., "The role of lipoic acid in product formation by Enterococcus faecalis NCTC 775 and reconstitution in vivo and in vitro of the pyruvate dehydrogenase complex.", JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 139, pages 1325 - 1329, XP002066638 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1328, column 2 - page 1329, column 1 * | [Y] - BERNARD N. ET AL., "Cloning of the D-lactate dehydrogenase gene from Lactobacillus delbrueckii subsp. bulgaricus by complementation in Escherichia coli.", FEBS LETTERS, (199109), vol. 290, no. 1,2, pages 61 - 64, XP002066639 [Y] 6,7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(91)81226-X | [A] - HODGSON J.A. ET AL., "Wild-type and mutant forms of the pyruvate dehydrogenase multienzyme complex from Bacillus subtilis.", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (19830501), vol. 211, no. 2, pages 463 - 472, XP002066640 [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - ARNAU J. ET AL., "Cloning, expression, and Characterization of the Lactococcus lactis pfl gene, encoding pyruvate formate lyase.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (199709), vol. 179, no. 18, pages 5884 - 5891, XP002055591 [A] * abstract * * page 5890, column 1, paragraph 2 * | [DA] - GARRIGUES C. ET AL., "Control of the shift from homolactic acid to mixed acid fermentation inLactococcus lactis: Predominant role of the NADH/NAD+ ratio.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (199709), vol. 179, no. 17, pages 5282 - 5287, XP002066807 [DA] 1 * page 5283, column 2, paragraph 8 * |