EP0998967 - Method of manufacturing a filtration bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8000 W. Florissant Avenue P.O. Box 4100 St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8000 W. Florissant Avenue P.O. Box 4100 St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US | ||
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states Branson Ultrasonics Corporation 41 Eagle Road, Commerce Park Danbury, Connecticut 06813 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Besuyen, John A. 44, Hillary Lane Penfield, N.Y. 14526 / US | 02 /
Buckley, Richard K. 14, Arlington Park Canandaigua, N.Y. 14424 / US | 03 /
Kuzniar, Eric 156 Robert Quigley Drive Scottsville, N.Y. 14546 / US | 04 /
Mainolfi, Sylvio J. 12 Bacon Road Roxbury, CT 06783 / US | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 99630085.1 | 08.11.1999 | [2000/19] | Priority number, date | US19980188159 | 07.11.1998 Original published format: US 188159 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0998967 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0998967 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/11, B01D29/27, B01D29/54 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
B01D29/111 (EP,US);
B01D29/27 (EP,US);
B01D39/16 (KR);
B29C65/0618 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/244 (EP,US);
B29C66/43 (EP,US);
B29C66/81433 (EP,US);
B29C66/81435 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/06] |
Former [2000/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Filterbeutels | [2000/19] | English: | Method of manufacturing a filtration bag | [2000/19] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de sac filtrant | [2000/19] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 13.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4545833 (TAFARA PETER T [US]) [Y] 1-4 * Background of the invention; column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 8; figures 3-6 *; | [Y]US5699683 (RIEKER GERD [US]) [Y] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 8; figures 2-5 *; | [YD]US3920504 (SHOH ANDREW, et al) [YD] 1-4 * the whole document * |