EP0938912 - Muscle stimulation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BMR Research and Development Limited BMR House, 16 Merchants Road County Galway / IE | [1999/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keaney, Diarmuid 9 St. Mary's Road County Galway / IE | [1999/35] | Representative(s) | Brophy, David Timothy, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Brophy, David, et al F.R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 99650018.7 | 26.02.1999 | [1999/35] | Priority number, date | IE19980000146 | 27.02.1998 Original published format: IE 980146 | [1999/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0938912 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36 | [1999/35] | CPC: |
A61N1/36003 (EP,US);
A61N1/3603 (EP,US);
A61N1/36034 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2000/21] |
Former [1999/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Muskelstimulationsgerät | [1999/35] | English: | Muscle stimulation apparatus | [1999/35] | French: | Appareil de stimulation musculaire | [1999/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 31.01.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0459945 (STIWELL S A [CH]) [X] 6 * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 3 * * column 9, line 13 - column 10, line 5 * * column 16, lines 19-25 * [A] 1,2,4; | [A]US5620483 (MINOGUE CONOR M [IE]) [A] 1,2,4,6 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 44 *; | [A]US5195517 (CHEN I-CHENG [TW]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, lines 14-47 * * column 3, lines 41-63 *; | [A]US5549656 (REISS HANS W [US]) [A] 1,3,6 * column 3, lines 27-37; figure 1 * |