EP0931934 - Pumping system for viscous materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dosiertechnik und Pneumatik AG Dopag Langackerstrasse 25 6330 Cham / CH | [1999/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suter, Peter Hofmatt 36 6332 Hagendorn / CH | [1999/30] | Representative(s) | Eder, Carl E. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Patent - Marken - Rechtsanwälte Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/30] | Eder, Carl E. Patentanwaltsbüro EDER AG Lindenhofstrasse 40 4052 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 99810063.0 | 26.01.1999 | [1999/30] | Priority number, date | CH19980000192 | 27.01.1998 Original published format: CH 19298 | [1999/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0931934 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F04B13/02, F04B7/02 | [1999/30] | CPC: |
F04B13/02 (EP);
F04B15/02 (EP);
F04B23/06 (EP);
F04B49/22 (EP);
F04B9/127 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/14] |
Former [1999/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Pumpen von fliessfähigen Materialien | [1999/30] | English: | Pumping system for viscous materials | [1999/30] | French: | Dispositif de pompage des matériaux visqueux | [1999/30] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/47] | 27.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.03.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.03.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19611339 (WAGNER WILHELM WIWA [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 35 - column 3, line 27 * * column 4, line 18 - line 34 * * column 5, line 1 - line 11 * * column 6, line 17 - line 40; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0167635 (LIBRA SA [SM]) [Y] 1-5 * page 5 - page 10 *; | [A]US4065230 (GEZARI WALTER A) [A] 1 * column 2, line 13 - line 27 * * column 3, line 30 - line 36 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 5 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 54 * * column 9, line 35 - column 10, line 11 * |