Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] |
04.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
14.08.2000 | Change - extension states | |
28.06.2000 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
28.06.2000 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
16.06.2000 | Definitive list of designations | published on 02.08.2000 [2000/31] |
08.10.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] |