EP0984107 - Mounting rail and connecting element for a support device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEBERIT TECHNIK AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [2000/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lechner, Peter Porthofstrasse 41 8645 Jona / CH | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 99810613.2 | 09.07.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | CH19980001817 | 04.09.1998 Original published format: CH 181798 | [2000/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0984107 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0984107 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0984107 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/01, E03D11/14, E04B1/58 | [2000/10] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Title | German: | Profilschiene und Verbindungselement für eine Tragvorrichtung | [2000/10] | English: | Mounting rail and connecting element for a support device | [2000/10] | French: | Rail profilé et élément de connection pour un dispositif de support | [2000/10] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.11.2005 | FI | 23.11.2005 | IE | 23.11.2005 | DK | 23.02.2006 | GR | 23.02.2006 | SE | 23.02.2006 | ES | 06.03.2006 | PT | 24.04.2006 | LU | 09.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
LU | 09.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
DK | 23.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
ES | 06.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
SE | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 23.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB782428 (JOHN POLLARD DENNIS) [A] 1,17,24,28* figure - *; | [X]DE1986270U (BETTERMANN ELEKTRO OHG [DE]) [X] 1-3,14,15,17,24,28 * page 10, line 12 - line 22; figures 6-10 *; | [A]DE1807892 (SWARTE MICHEL DE) [A] 1,17,24,28 * figure - *; | [A]EP0004603 (STANGEL HELMUT [DE]) [A] 1,17,24,28 * figure - *; | [DX]EP0493319 (GEBERIT AG [CH]) [DX] 1-3,17,19,24,28 * the whole document *; | [DX]DE9216799U (NEEB) [DX] 1-3,9,14-21,24,25,27,28 * figures 1,10,11 * | Examination | DE4336187 | DE19536926 | by applicant | DE3528334 | EP0493319 | DE9216799U |