EP1086764 - Twin roll strip casting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heinrich Marti Main Management Inspiration Wassbergstrasse 28 8127 Forch / CH | [2001/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbé, Jacques 9, rue des Trois Meules 42100 Saint-Etienne / FR | 02 /
Marti, Heinrich Wassbergstrasse 28 8127 Forch / CH | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner AG Patentanwälte Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Luchs, Willi Luchs & Partner, Patentanwälte, Schulhausstrasse 12 8002 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 99811005.0 | 03.11.1999 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2001/49] |
Former [2001/13] | CH19990001749 | 24.09.1999 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086764 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
B22D11/066 (EP,US);
B22D11/0622 (KR);
B22D11/122 (KR);
B22D27/003 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/51] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bandgiessmaschine mit zwei Giessrollen | [2001/13] | English: | Twin roll strip casting device | [2001/13] | French: | Appareil de coulée de bande a deux cylindres | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 28.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 29.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/42] | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.11.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05329583 ; | [A]JPS61176447 ; | [A]DE4307850 (USINOR SACILOR PUTEAUX [FR], et al) [A] 1,16* claims 1,4 *; | [A]DE19617420 (MAX PLANCK INST EISENFORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,10 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940314), vol. 018, no. 151, Database accession no. (M - 1576), & JP05329583 A 19931214 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861225), vol. 010, no. 388, Database accession no. (M - 549), & JP61176447 A 19860808 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * |