EP1006643 - Generator cooling system with return refrigerant mixing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd CHSP Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Alstom 25, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse 16 5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glahn, Joern Axel, Dr. 125 South Street, Apt. 300 Vernon, CT 06066 / US | 02 /
Baumgartner, Josef Chänelmatt 12 6026 Rain / CH | 03 /
Jung, Michael, Dr. Bloisstrasse 38a 79761 Waldshut / DE | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/48] |
Former [2002/01] | Liebe, Rainer, et al ALSTOM (Switzerland)Ltd CHSP Intellectual Property Haselstrasse 16/699/5.OG 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2000/23] | Liebe, Rainer ABB Business Services Ltd., Intellectual Property (SLE-I), Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 99811016.7 | 05.11.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | DE1998156455 | 03.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19856455 | [2000/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1006643 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1006643 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1006643 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02K9/08 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
H02K9/10 (EP,US);
H02K9/12 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/42] |
Former [2000/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Generatorkühlung mit Kühlernachlaufmischung | [2000/23] | English: | Generator cooling system with return refrigerant mixing | [2000/23] | French: | Système de refroidissement pour générateur avec mélange du réfrigérant de retour | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 30.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT | 09.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Request for further processing for: | 12.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.03.2005 | Decision despatched | 09.06.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 09.06.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.09.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2427702 (BAUDRY RENE A) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE868176 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1* figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2650994 (BAHN JOHN J) [X] 1 * column 2, line 16 - line 54 * * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 68; figure 1 *; | [X]DE1058619 (ALLIS CHALMERS MFG CO) [X] 1,2,5 * column 1, line 52 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 39 - line 47 * * column 4, line 34 - line 54 * * column 5, line 21 - line 26; figure 1 *; | [X]US4071791 (ARMOR ANTHONY F, et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 39 * * column 5, line 16 - line 35; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]EP0299908 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,5-7 * column 2, line 6 - line 47 * * column 3, line 11 - line 16 * * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 26; figures 1,2,5,6 * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]DE19645272 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [Y] 2-4 * column 3, line 35 - line 48; figure 1 * |