EP1029501 - A dishwasher with a radiant heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Candy S.p.A. Via Missori, 8 20052 Monza (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states CANDY S.p.A. Via Missori, 8 I-20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fumagalli, Silvano Via Grigna, 2 20052 Monza-Milano / IT | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99830076.8 | 15.02.1999 | [2000/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1029501 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1029501 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
A47L15/4285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2001/19] |
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Geschirrspülmaschine mit einem Heizstrahler | [2000/34] | English: | A dishwasher with a radiant heater | [2000/34] | French: | Machine à laver la vaisselle à chauffage radiant | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 24.02.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.04.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.04.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0591774 (MIELE & CIE) [X] 1-6,9,11,15-17 * column 4, line 14 - column 7, line 8; figures 1-4 *; | [A]JPH0686751 ; | [A]EP0075274 (ELPAG AG CHUR) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1226248 (MIELE&CIE) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0744150 (ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI ELETTRODOME) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940629), vol. 018, no. 344, Database accession no. (C - 1218), & JP06086751 A 19940329 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,9,14-17 * abstract * |