EP0976910 - Device for the automatic control of the stop cursors of motor reducers in roller shutters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GAPOSA S.r.l. Via Pompeiana, 220 I-63023 Fermo (AP) / IT | [2000/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Postacchini, Dante Via Puccini, 17 63023 Fermo / IT | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio Piazza Ghislieri, 3 60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT | [2000/05] | Application number, filing date | 99830128.7 | 09.03.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | IT1998AN00013U | 12.03.1998 Original published format: IT AN980013 U | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0976910 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0976910 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/88 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
E06B9/88 (EP);
E06B2009/6881 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/26] |
Former [2000/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur automatischen Steuerung der Anschlagsschieber von Motor-Untersetzungsgetrieben in Rolladen | [2000/05] | English: | Device for the automatic control of the stop cursors of motor reducers in roller shutters | [2000/05] | French: | Dispositif de commande automatique des curseurs de butoir des motoréducteurs dans les volets roulants | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/09] | 30.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.06.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.06.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2459776 (SIMU SOC IND METAL USINE) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2412483 (SIMU SOC IND METAL USINE) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2272019 (COVEMAT) [X] 2 * page 3, line 27 - line 30 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 9; figure - *; | [X]DE19533996 (BECKER ANTRIEBE GMBH) [X] 2 * the whole document * |