blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0964116

EP0964116 - Immersion vibrator powered by a transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
S.I.M.E. S.p.A.
Via Santa Margherita, 89/91
20047 Brugherio (Milano) / IT
[1999/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Grande, Saverio
Zugerstrasse 93
8820 Wädenswil / CH
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Pizzoli, Antonio Mario, et al
Società Italiana Brevetti SpA
Via G. Carducci 8
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]Pizzoli, Antonio, et al
Società Italiana Brevetti SpA, Via Carducci, 8
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99830335.831.05.1999
[1999/50]
Priority number, dateCH1998000124709.06.1998         Original published format: CH 124798
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0964116
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.1999
ClassificationIPC:E04G21/08
[1999/50]
CPC:
E04G21/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/34]
Former [1999/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesAL13.01.2000
LT13.01.2000
LV13.01.2000
MK13.01.2000
RO13.01.2000
SI13.01.2000
TitleGerman:Von einem Umformer gespeister Innenrüttler[1999/50]
English:Immersion vibrator powered by a transformer[1999/50]
French:Aiguille vibrante alimentée par un transformateur[1999/50]
Examination procedure13.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/11]
16.06.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.09.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, LI
05.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/21]
19.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/21]
Request for further processing for:31.08.2001Request for further processing filed
31.08.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.09.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
16.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
12.07.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3782693  (STROHBECK G) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 22 * * figure - *;
 [A]US3180625  (ANDREW WYZENBEEK) [A] 3 * figure 1 *;
 [DA]EP0604723  (WACKER WERKE KG [DE]);
 [PX]DE19824372  (BOMAG GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 25 - line 68 * * figure - *;
 [PX]FR2761391  (ELECTRONIQUE AU SERVICE DU BET [FR]) [PX] 1,2 * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 15 * * page 5, line 6 - line 25 * * figures 1,6 *
by applicantEP0604723
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.