EP1067605 - Ferroelectric memory cell and corresponding manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casagrande, Giulio Via Sala, 11 20060 Vignate (Milano) / IT | 02 /
Zambrano, Raffaele Via Petrone, 69 95029 Catania / IT | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/02] | Botti, Mario Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99830431.5 | 05.07.1999 | [2001/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1067605 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/115, H01L21/8242 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
H10B53/30 (EP,US);
H10B53/00 (EP,US);
H10B12/315 (EP,US);
H10B12/482 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/39] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ferroelektrische Speicherzelle und deren Herstellungsverfahren | [2001/02] | English: | Ferroelectric memory cell and corresponding manufacturing method | [2001/02] | French: | Cellule de mémoire ferroélectrique et son procédé de fabrication | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 06.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/31] | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4149301 (COOK ROBERT C); | [A]EP0793274 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [XA]US5834348 (KWON KEE-WON [KR], et al); | [XA]EP0905786 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |