EP1036899 - A cremone bolt handle for doors and windows [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GSG INTERNATIONAL S.p.A. Via Tubertini, 1 40054 Budrio (Bologna) / IT | [2001/36] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states GIESSE S.p.A. Via Tubertini, 1 I-40054 Budrio (Bologna) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lambertini, Marco Via Martiri di Pizzocalvo, 8 40068 San Lazzaro di Savena, Bologna / IT | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 99830569.2 | 10.09.1999 | [2000/38] | Priority number, date | IT1999BO00128 | 17.03.1999 Original published format: IT BO990128 | [2000/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1036899 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1036899 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E05B1/00, E05C9/00, E05B63/18, E05B13/10, E05D15/526 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
E05C9/021 (EP);
E05B13/106 (EP);
E05B63/185 (EP);
E05C9/066 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/38] | E05B1/00, E05C9/00, E05B63/18, E05B13/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | Betätigungsgriff für Treibstangenschlösser einer Tür oder eines Fensters | [2000/38] | English: | A cremone bolt handle for doors and windows | [2000/38] | French: | Poignée pour crémone de porte ou de fenêtre | [2000/38] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 13.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 14.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1907760 (NOTTER EUGEN) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2182706 (SECURISTYLE LTD) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2200944 (HARDWARE & SYSTEMS PATENTS LTD) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2205605 (HASP INT LTD) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [DYA]EP0446566 (GIESSE SPA [IT]) [DY] 10-12 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [Y]GB2281585 (PLUS PLAN [GB]) [Y] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5634357 (NUTTER CURTIS F [US], et al) [A] 10-12* column W * | by applicant | IT227820 | EP0446566 | ITBO940059 |