EP0994043 - Package for a pile of flat objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gomes Technology S.p.A. No. 10/14, Via Sacco e Vanzetti 41042 Fiorano Modenese (MO) / IT | [2000/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mescoli, Giuliano no. 14, Via Toscanini 41043 Formigine (MO) / FR | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Via M. Vellani, 20 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. No. 25, Via Emilia Est 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 99830604.7 | 23.09.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | IT1998MO00034U | 15.10.1998 Original published format: IT MO980034 U | [2000/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0994043 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/46, B65D81/05 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
B65B23/20 (EP);
B65B11/585 (EP);
B65D81/05 (EP);
B65D85/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2001/01] |
Former [2000/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Behälter für einen Stapel flacher Gegenstände | [2000/16] | English: | Package for a pile of flat objects | [2000/16] | French: | Emballage pour une pile d'objets plats | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/30] | 13.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19522522 (FISCHER MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH) [A] 1 * column 2, line 2 - line 9; figure 4 *; | [A]FR2621895 (PARISOT STE NLE FABRIQUES MEUB) [A] * page 8, line 23 - line 32; figures 2,3 * |