EP1020317 - An engine-gearbox assembly, in particular for motorcycles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNETI MARELLI S.p.A. Via Griziotti 4 20145 Milano / IT | [2000/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martelli, Pier Paolo Via A. Di Vincenzo, 41 40129 Bologna / IT | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2000/29] | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl, Corso Fiume 6 10133 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 99830756.5 | 06.12.1999 | [2000/29] | Priority number, date | IT1999TO00017 | 13.01.1999 Original published format: IT TO990017 | [2000/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1020317 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/22, B62K11/14, // B60K41/28, B62K23/02, F01M1/02 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (EP,US);
B60W10/11 (EP,US);
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
B60W30/1819 (EP,US);
B62K11/14 (EP,US);
B62K23/02 (EP,US);
F01M1/02 (EP,US);
F16H2059/0243 (EP,US);
F16H59/02 (EP,US);
F16H61/0021 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2001/14] |
Former [2000/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Motor- Getriebe- Einheit, insbesondere für Motorräder | [2000/29] | English: | An engine-gearbox assembly, in particular for motorcycles | [2000/29] | French: | Ensemble moto-réducteur, en particulier pour motocyclette | [2000/29] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 20.01.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 25.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/27] | 29.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5688205 (BUEHLER ROGER [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract *; | [X]GB2308874 (LUK GETRIEBE SYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 14; claims 1-3,16,17,38 *; | [A]DE2053685 (AISIN SEIKI) [A] 1,3 * figure -; claim - * * pump 33 feeds common oil supply to actuators *; | [A]US5667044 (CHOI MANLIM [KR]) [A] 3 * figure 6; claim 1 *; | [A]US5469946 (NGUYEN PHUONG H [US]) [A] 3 * abstract *; column 5, lines 1-13 *; | [E]GB2331344 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1 * claim 3 *; | [E]US5928106 (BIROS JR THOMAS A [US], et al) [E] 3 * abstract * |