EP1018313 - Upholstered furniture with seat which is reversible to obtain different degrees of springing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bardi S.R.L. Via Statale, 235, Fraz. Olmi 51038 Quarrata Pistooia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states Bardi S.R.L. Via Statale, 235, Fraz. Olmi 51038 Quarrata, Pistooia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pacini, Marco Via Papa Giovanni XXIII, 26/B 59100 Prato / IT | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci, Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 99830780.5 | 16.12.1999 | [2000/28] | Priority number, date | IT1998FI00273 | 18.12.1998 Original published format: IT FI980273 | [2000/28] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1018313 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47C23/00, A47C23/30, A47C7/34 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
A47C7/35 (EP);
A47C23/05 (EP);
A47C7/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/13] |
Former [2000/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Polstermöbel mit einem zur Herstellung unterschiedlicher Grade der Federung umkehrbaren Sitz | [2000/28] | English: | Upholstered furniture with seat which is reversible to obtain different degrees of springing | [2000/28] | French: | Mobilier capitonné avec un siège qui est réversible pour obtenir différents degrés d'élasticité | [2000/28] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 13.01.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 06.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3081130 (WIELAND CLIFFORD C) [A] 1* figure 4; claim 1 *; | [X]US4083069 (GLICKMAN MANUEL) [X] 1-4 * column 1, lines 34-37 * * column 2, lines 38-44; figure -; claim 1 * |