EP1112712 - A vacuum cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLTI S.p.A. Via Ferloni, 83 22070 Bulgarograsso (Como) / IT | [2001/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Polti, Franco Via Repubblica, 17 22070 Olgiate Comasco-Como / IT | 02 /
Fassina, Fabio Via I Maggio, 6 22929 Pare'-Como / IT | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al Perani & Partners S.p.A. Piazza Armando Diaz, 7 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Perani, Aurelio, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila 5 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2001/27] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99830819.1 | 30.12.1999 | [2001/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1112712 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1112712 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/18, A47L5/36 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
A47L9/181 (EP);
A47L5/362 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/27] | Title | German: | Staubsauger | [2001/27] | English: | A vacuum cleaner | [2001/27] | French: | Aspirateur | [2001/27] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 26.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.12.2006
10.01.2007
ADMISSIBLE Lavorwash S.p.A. Via Liguria, 7/A-7/B 46029 Suzzara (Mantova) / IT Opponent's representative Botti, Mario, et al, et al Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | 02
27.04.2010
27.04.2010
INTERVENTION De'Longhi Appliances S.r.l. Via L. Seitz 47 31100 Treviso / IT Opponent's representative Mati, Silvia, et al, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.12.2006
10.01.2007
ADMISSIBLE Lavorwash S.p.A. Via Liguria, 7/A-7/B 46029 Suzzara (Mantova) / IT Opponent's representative Botti, Mario, et al, et al Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | ||
02
27.04.2010
27.04.2010
INTERVENTION De'Longhi Appliances S.r.l. Via L. Seitz 47 31100 Treviso / IT Opponent's representative Mati, Silvia, et al, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | |||
Former [2007/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.12.2006
ADMISSIBLE Lavorwash S.p.A. Via Liguria, 7/A-7/B 46029 Suzzara (Mantova) / IT Opponent's representative Botti, Mario, et al, et al Botti & Ferrari S.r.l., Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 02.02.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.08.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.08.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.08.2008 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.05.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/35] | 28.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 15.10.2008 | Appeal received No. T2057/08 | 15.12.2008 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.05.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 28.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.06.2010 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 29.03.2006 | LI | 29.03.2006 | [2011/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0366344 ; | [Y]WO8900021 (PEARSON ALWYN HAROLD [AU]) [Y] 11,12 * abstract * * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 7 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5343592 (PARISE CARL [US]) [A] 13* abstract *; | [XY]FR2745169 (VAP IND FRANCE SA [FR]) [X] 1-6,14,15 * abstract * * page 5, line 6 - line 35 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 7,8,11,12; | [X]DE19720101 (SOLOUKI BAHMAN DR [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8,14,15 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910606), vol. 015, no. 221, Database accession no. (C - 0838), & JP03066344 A 19910322 (SANKYO REIJIYATSUKU KK) [Y] 7,8 * abstract * * figure - * |