EP0959277 - An arrangement comprising a rotary shaft and a seal device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/47] | A seal device | ||
[2003/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Manufacturing Enterprises, Inc. 1105 North Market Street Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bratthäll, Johan Borevägen 6 Saltsjö-Boo / SE | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik, et al Dr Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 17192 104 62 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1999/47] | Larsson, Sten ITT FLYGT AB Box 1309 171 25 Solna / SE | Application number, filing date | 99850040.9 | 18.03.1999 | [1999/47] | Priority number, date | SE19980001731 | 18.05.1998 Original published format: SE 9801731 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0959277 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0959277 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | [2000/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959277 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/34 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
F16J15/3404 (EP,US);
F16J15/3484 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT [2001/17] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Eine eine Welle und eine Dichtungsvorrichtung umfassende Einrichtung | [2003/42] | English: | An arrangement comprising a rotary shaft and a seal device | [2003/42] | French: | Arrangement comprenant un arbre rotatif et un dispositif d'étanchéité | [2003/42] |
Former [1999/47] | Dichtungsvorrichtung | ||
Former [1999/47] | A seal device | ||
Former [1999/47] | Dispositif d'étanchéité | Examination procedure | 02.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 19.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7110850U (SONESSON PUMPINDUSTRIE AB) [A] 1 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 19 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2628852 (VOYTECH CHARLES F) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 12-52 ** figure 1 *; | [A]FR2008305 (EMU UNTERWASSERPUMPEN) [A] 1 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 8 * * figure 1 *; | [A]BE747755 (SUSSMEYER LOUIS) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 17-24 * * figure . *; | [X]US3888495 (MAYER EHRHARD) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 12-16 * * column 4, lines 33-48 * * column 5, lines 25-47 * * figure . *; | [A]US5238253 (SIEGHARTNER LEONARD J [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 47 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * | by applicant | SE381318 | SE200144 | SE466925 | SE327904 |