Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0951061 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0951061



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 121
27.03.2008 Closing of application Search / examination 2
13.12.2007 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
27.07.2007 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.07.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.07.2007 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.04.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
19.04.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.03.2005 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
06.08.2004 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
27.04.2004 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
13.02.2004 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
04.02.2004 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
30.12.2003 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
30.12.2003 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
30.12.2003 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
14.07.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.05.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
26.05.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.05.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
08.09.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.07.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.07.1999 Priority document Search / examination 19
11.06.1999 Priority document Search / examination 18
01.06.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.06.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.06.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.06.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.03.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
29.03.1999 Description Search / examination 14
29.03.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.03.1999 Drawings Search / examination 1
29.03.1999 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
29.03.1999 Priority document Search / examination 19
29.03.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7