Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0951061
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.03.2008 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] |
30.11.2007 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.07.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.04.2007 |
First examination report |
|
17.04.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2004 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
08.06.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
08.06.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
23.04.2004 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.04.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.02.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] |
11.02.2004 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
19.01.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] |
09.01.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.05.2003 |
Publication of search report |
published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] |
23.05.2003 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] |
05.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.09.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |