21.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] |
20.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] |
03.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
04.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
14.10.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] |
18.03.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] |
14.01.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] |
03.12.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] |
03.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
20.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
13.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
13.02.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] |
24.01.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] |
18.12.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.12.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.07.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.06.2003 |
New entry: Examination report or reply |
|
14.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.09.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.08.2002 |
First examination report |
|
09.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.04.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
04.01.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 20.02.2002 [2002/08] |
08.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.07.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.08.2001 [2001/35] |
06.04.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] |